IL SB3686 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-1033
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-1033
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Creates the Portable and Medium-Format Battery Stewardship Act (rather than the Portable Battery Stewardship Act). Requires those who sell, offer for sale, or distribute (rather than only sell or distribute), covered batteries or battery-containing products containing one or more covered batteries in or into the State to implement and participate in a battery stewardship plan. Makes changes to provisions regarding timelines for covered batteries, as well as timelines for battery stewardship organizations to submit plans to the Agency for approval. Provides that the Illinois Pollution Control Board (rather than the Agency) may adopt rules regarding certain labeling requirements. Repeals a provision regarding rechargeable batteries in the Environmental Protection Act. Changes some defined terms and removes some defined terms.
Title
BATTERY STEWARDSHIP ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-24 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-1033 |
2024-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2024 |
2024-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2024-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2024-05-24 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 045-014-000 |
2024-05-24 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Energy and Public Utilities; 012-004-000 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Energy and Public Utilities |
2024-05-23 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-23 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David Koehler |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 22, 2024 |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2024-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 077-035-000 |
2024-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-05-17 | House | Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl |
2024-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2024-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2024-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2024-05-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 018-008-000 |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2024-05-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2024-05-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2024-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 019-008-000 |
2024-04-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Energy and Public Utilities; 014-000-000 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Energy and Public Utilities; 015-000-000 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |