IL SB3604 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1025
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Governor's appointees to the Advisory Board of Livestock Commissioners to, among other things, be interested in the well-being of domestic animals and poultry. Provides that the Governor's appointees to the Board shall serve for a term of 5 years. Requires the Illinois Department of Agriculture's rules pertaining to the well-being of domestic animals and poultry to be submitted to the Board for its approval. Requires the Director of Agriculture to call semiannual meetings of the Board and authorizes the Director to call additional meetings. Removes a provision that exempts the Department from seeking the Board's certification before adopting certain rules. Prohibits the representative of an ex-officio member from exercising the voting privileges of that member in his or her absence. Also makes technical changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ANIMALS-LIVESTOCK ADVISORY BD

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-12 Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1025
2010-07-12 Effective Date July 12, 2010
2010-07-12 Governor Approved
2010-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2010-04-15 Passed Both Houses
2010-04-15 Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2010-04-15 Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore
2010-04-14 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2010-04-14 Second Reading - Short Debate
2010-04-13 Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2010-04-13 Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000
2010-04-13 Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black
2010-03-22 Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2010-03-17 Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard P. Myers
2010-03-17 Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia
2010-03-11 Referred to Rules Committee
2010-03-11 First Reading
2010-03-11 Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
2010-03-11 Chief House Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2010-03-11 Arrived in House
2010-03-11 Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2010-03-11 Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi
2010-03-11 Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Deanna Demuzio
2010-03-10 Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski
2010-03-10 Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2010-03-10 Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2010-03-10 Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby
2010-03-10 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 11, 2010
2010-03-10 Second Reading
2010-03-10 Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2010-03-03 Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2010-03-03 Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2010-03-03 Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary G. Dahl
2010-03-03 Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 4, 2010
2010-03-03 Do Pass Agriculture and Conservation; 009-000-000
2010-02-25 Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John O. Jones
2010-02-24 Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation
2010-02-19 Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan
2010-02-11 Referred to Assignments
2010-02-11 First Reading
2010-02-11 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback