IL SB3561 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Building Commission Act. Changes various repeal dates from June 1, 2018 to June 1, 2023 in provisions concerning allowing public building commissions to use the design-build delivery method for public projects. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BLDG COMMISSION-DESIGN-BUILD

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-05-29SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-000-000
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2018-04-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-18HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-18HouseArrived in House
2018-04-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-04-04SenateDo Pass State Government; 008-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
50202.5Amended CodeCitation Text
502020Amended CodeCitation Text
502020.10Amended CodeCitation Text
502020.15Amended CodeCitation Text
502020.20Amended CodeCitation Text
502020.25Amended CodeCitation Text
502020.3Amended CodeCitation Text
502020.4Amended CodeCitation Text
502020.5Amended CodeCitation Text
502023.5Amended CodeCitation Text
50203Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback