IL SB3503 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0947
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0947
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that on or before June 1, 2019, every facility that houses a circuit court room shall include at least one lactation room or area for members of the public to express breast milk in private that is located outside the confines of a restroom and includes, at minimum, a chair, a table, and an electrical outlet, as well as a sink with running water where possible. Provides that the lactation rooms and areas shall also meet with reasonable minimum standards prescribed by the Supreme Court of Illinois, which the Supreme Court is requested to create, including requirements for posting of notice to the public regarding location and access to lactation rooms and areas, as well as requirements for the addition of a sink with running water in the event of renovation to the facilities. Requests the Supreme Court to create minimum standards for training of courthouse staff and personnel regarding location and access to lactation rooms and areas for all people present in the courthouse who need to use lactation rooms and areas.
Title
COUNTIES CD-LACTATION ROOMS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0947 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-003-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-04-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 009-000-000 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-1106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |