IL SB3398 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Professional Service Corporation Act. Provides that the certificate of registration shall expire on January 1, 2019, and on January 1 of every third year thereafter, for any professional service corporation that renders services that are regulated by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Establishes a renewal fee of $40 for a certificate of registration issued by the Department. Makes similar changes to the Medical Corporation Act. Amends the Limited Liability Company Act. Defines "professional limited liability company". Removes provisions prohibiting a limited liability company from rendering certain professional services, and instead provides that a limited liability company that intends to provide a professional service licensed by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation must be formed in compliance with the Professional Limited Liability Company Act. Amends the Professional Limited Liability Company Act. Defines "license". Provides that one or more individuals may organize a professional limited liability company by filing articles of organization with the Secretary of State on forms furnished by the Secretary. Sets forth certain requirements the articles of organization must satisfy. Provides that the company name of a professional limited liability company must contain the terms "professional limited liability company", "P.L.L.C.", or "PLLC". Lists the professional services a professional limited liability company may render, with certain exceptions. Provides that a professional limited liability company's certificate of registration shall expire on January 1, 2019 and on January 1 of every third year thereafter; and that the renewal fee for a certificate of registration shall be $40 (rather than calculated at the rate of $40 per year). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DFPR-PROFESSIONAL SERVICES-LLC

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 009-000-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Althoff
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 20, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 011-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8051012Amended CodeCitation Text
805156Amended CodeCitation Text
8051801-25Amended CodeCitation Text
8051801-5Amended CodeCitation Text
80518511New CodeSee Bill Text
80518512New CodeSee Bill Text
80518513New CodeSee Bill Text
80518515Amended CodeCitation Text
8051852New CodeSee Bill Text
8051855Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback