IL SB3223 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0733
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0733
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Death Review Team Act by repealing provisions permitting the Child Death Review Teams Executive Council to establish in the Southern Region of the State a special Child Death Investigation Task Force. Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Provides that the Department of Children and Family Services shall establish a Child Death Investigation Task Force to operate in the Southern Region of the State and in other regions at the discretion of the Director of the Department. Requires the Task Force to develop and implement a plan for the investigation of sudden, unexpected, or unexplained child fatalities or near fatalities of children under 18 years of age occurring within that region. Requires the Task Force's plan to include provisions for local or State law enforcement agencies and other specified entities to promptly notify the Task Force of a sudden, unexpected, or unexplained child fatality or near fatality of a child, and for the Task Force to review and investigate the notification. Requires the investigation to include coordination among members of a multidisciplinary team. Provides for appointment of a Board of Directors to govern the Task Force. Provides for State indemnification of the Task Force and the Board of Directors, except for willful or wanton misconduct.
Title
DCFS-CHILD DEATH INVESTIGATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0733 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-001-000 |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-04-18 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 007-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 515 | 45 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
325 | 5 | 11.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
325 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |