IL SB3170 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act and the Illinois Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act. Provides that a prescription for medication other than controlled substances shall be valid for up to 15 months from the date issued for the purpose of refills, unless the prescription states otherwise.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PHARMACY-PRESCRIPTIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 046-000-000
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
225853Amended CodeCitation Text
4106202.36Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback