IL SB3105 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-8)
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-28 - Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Provides that law enforcement officers, in an effort to assist the Department of Children and Family Services in child protective investigations in its response to reports of child abuse or neglect, must, upon request of a child protection investigator, accompany the child protection investigator. Provides that it is the responsibility of the accompanying officer to accompany the child protection investigator to any other police jurisdiction that is outside the accompanying officer's primary jurisdiction. Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois, the Counties Code, and the Illinois Municipal Code making conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCFS-LAW ENFORCEMENT ASSIST

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-28HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-28SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Human Services; 007-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026052605-433New CodeSee Bill Text
32557.4bNew CodeSee Bill Text
5553-6015.5New CodeSee Bill Text
65511-1-2.2New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback