IL SB3052 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Contractor Prompt Payment Act. Prohibits the withholding of a retainage from progress payments or final payments in excess of 5% of the payment. Effective immediately.
Title
CONTRACT PROMPT PAY RETAINAGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 48 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | Senate | Total Veto Stands |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto November 14, 2018 |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 063-048-004 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-30 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-05-29 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-05-29 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2018-05-28 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-05-28 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2018-05-25 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. David B. Reis |
2018-05-25 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. David B. Reis |
2018-05-25 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. David B. Reis |
2018-05-25 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. David B. Reis |
2018-05-25 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. David B. Reis |
2018-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 006-003-000 |
2018-05-24 | House | Remains in Executive Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Executive Committee; 005-006-000 |
2018-05-23 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-05-17 | House | Re-assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-05-15 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2018-05-15 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2018-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-05-11 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2018-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2018-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-05-09 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-016-001 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Mulroe |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-003-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-003-000 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |