IL SB2923 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Graveyards Act and the Township Code. Provides that if a township supervisor issues a payout from the township treasury for any purpose, the township clerk shall attest to all moneys paid out. Amends the Illinois Highway Code with similar provisions concerning the road district clerk attesting to all moneys paid out of the road district's treasury or township treasury. Effective on January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL-PAYOUT ATTESTATIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Counties & Townships Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-04-25HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 1, 2018
2018-02-28SenateDo Pass Local Government; 007-000-000
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Local Government
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
506102cAmended CodeCitation Text
6017-27New CodeSee Bill Text
60556-114.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback