IL SB2822 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Private Business and Vocational Schools Act of 2012, the Private College Act, and the Academic Degree Act. Defines "religious institution" in these Acts. Provides that any religious institution (instead of any institution devoted entirely to the teaching of religion or theology) shall not be considered to be a private business and vocational school; makes related changes. Provides that no religious institution shall be subject to the educational requirements, standards, or demands contained in the Private College Act or the Academic Degree Act or in those Acts' administrative rules, and requires a religious institution to notify each of its students in writing that the religious degree being earned or course work earned at a religious, non-accredited, post-secondary educational institution may not transfer to other institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGHR ED-RELIGIOUS INSTITUTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-16HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McConchie
2018-04-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 010-000-001
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Higher Education
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018
2018-02-27SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 009-000-002
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10542615Amended CodeCitation Text
10542620Amended CodeCitation Text
10542630Amended CodeCitation Text
11010051.5New CodeSee Bill Text
110101011Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback