IL SB2822 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0628
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0628
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Dental Practice Act. Defines the terms "deep sedation", "general anesthesia", and "moderate sedation". Provides for the minimum education requirements for permits to administer deep sedation, general anesthesia, and moderate sedation. Replaces all uses of the term "conscious sedation" with the term "moderate sedation". Effective immediately.
Title
DENTAL SEDATION PERMITS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-01 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0628 |
2024-07-01 | Senate | Effective Date July 1, 2024 |
2024-07-01 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-001-000 |
2024-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2024-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4a |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4a |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 005-000-000 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 25 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 25 | 19.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 25 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 25 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 25 | 8.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |