IL SB2662 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1128
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1128
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the legislative purpose of the Act.
Title
HUMAN SERVICES CONTRACTING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-27 - House - Motion in House (Y: 91 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 40 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 40 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-29 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1128 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Effective Date November 27, 2018 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Both Houses Override Total Veto |
2018-11-27 | House | Override Governor Veto - House Passed 091-018-000 |
2018-11-27 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-15 | House | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-11-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2018-11-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Override Governor Veto - Senate Passed 051-001-000 |
2018-11-14 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto November 14, 2018 |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-040-001 |
2018-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Rules Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2018-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-05-17 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-05-17 | House | Substitute House Sponsorship Request Accepted No Action Taken by Rules |
2018-05-09 | House | Substitute House Sponsorship Request Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-09 | House | Substitute House Sponsorship Request Filed Pursuant Rule 37(c) - Sen. Laura Murphy |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2018-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Murphy |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 009-001-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1305 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |