IL SB2619 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6)
Status: Passed on November 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6)
Status: Passed on November 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. In provisions regarding appointment of a fire chief, acting chief, department head, or a position, by whatever title, that is responsible for day-to-day operations of a fire department for greater than 180 days, limits home rule powers on and after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI-APPOINTMENT OF FIRE CHIEF
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-27 - House - Motion in House (Y: 84 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Motion in House (Y: 57 N: 46 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Motion in House (Y: 57 N: 46 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-29 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1126 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Both Houses Override Total Veto |
2018-11-27 | House | Override Governor Veto - House Passed 084-026-001 |
2018-11-27 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-27 | House | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-11-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2018-11-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Override Governor Veto - Senate Passed 047-004-000 |
2018-11-14 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto November 14, 2018 |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 087-024-003 |
2018-05-29 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Home Rule Note Request is Inapplicable |
2018-05-24 | House | Motion Prevailed 057-046-001 |
2018-05-24 | House | Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-05-24 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Request is Inapplicable |
2018-05-24 | House | Motion Prevailed 057-046-001 |
2018-05-24 | House | Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-05-23 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2018-05-23 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-05-23 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-05-23 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-05-23 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-05-21 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-002-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Anderson |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 006-003-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 007-001-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 10-1-7.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 10-2.1-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |