IL SB2516 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1071
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1071
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Requires an employer, or the employer's representative, to inform an employee of available mandated reporter training prior to the employee signing a statement that the employee has knowledge and understanding of certain reporting requirements under the Act. Provides that the mandated reporter training may include, but not be limited to, training provided by the employer or the Department of Children and Family Services.
Title
DCFS-MANDATED REPORTER TRAIN
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] |
Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1071 |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 006-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services |
2018-05-22 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-22 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 23, 2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-001-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-05-16 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2018-05-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-03-13 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 045-000-000 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 007-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
325 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |