IL SB2498 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0706
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0706
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act. In provisions governing conditions under which certain non-parents may petition for visitation, requires that the parent-child relationship has been legally established (instead of "parentage has been established by a court of competent jurisdiction"). Provides that if the petitioner is a grandparent or great-grandparent, the parent-child relationship need be legally established only with respect to the parent who is related to the grandparent or great-grandparent. Provides that if the petitioner is a step-parent, the parent-child relationship need be legally established only with respect to the parent who is married to the petitioner or was married to the petitioner immediately before the parent's death.
Title
IMDMA-GRANDPARENT VISITATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0706 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-004-000 |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-05-16 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | House | To Domestic Relations Law Subcommittee |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-03-13 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 21, 2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
750 | 5 | 602.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |