IL SB2493 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that a person may supplementally feed deer with items otherwise prohibited by the Code when not in active deer hunting season which shall be implemented by the Department of Natural Resources by rule.
Title
WILDLIFE CD-DEER FEED
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] | Rep. Brad Halbrook [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Michael McAuliffe [R] |
Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-11-14 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 82 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 82 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | Senate | Total Veto Stands |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Override Governor Veto - Senate Lost 034-005-001 |
2018-11-14 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto November 14, 2018 |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2018-07-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Motion Withdrawn Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 046-004-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Agriculture; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Agriculture |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 29, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 082-028-001 |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 010-001-000 |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2018-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2018-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-001-000 |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-02 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2018-05-02 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-001-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Rose |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture; 008-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 010-000-000 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 2.26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |