IL SB2480 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Illinois Hazardous Materials Workforce Training Act. Provides that the Environmental Protection Agency shall develop by rule a curriculum of approved advanced safety training for workers at high hazard facilities. Provides that an owner or operator, when contracting for the performance of construction work at the stationary source, shall require that its contractors and any subcontractors use a skilled and trained workforce to perform all onsite work within an apprenticeable occupation in the building and construction trades. Provides a penalty for violation of the Act. Creates the Illinois Hazardous Materials Workforce Training Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Makes corresponding changes in the State Finance Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HAZARDOUS MATERIALS WORKFORCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 010-005-000
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018
2018-04-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Labor; 010-005-000
2018-04-09SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-03-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-02-28SenatePostponed - Labor
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Labor
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.886New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback