IL SB2351 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Dual Credit Quality Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 009-004-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 27 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |