IL SB2312 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Makes appropriations from the School Infrastructure Fund to the State Board of Education for school district broadband expansion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$ISBE-BROADBAND EXPANSION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations II
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass Appropriations II; 011-000-000
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-01-30SenateAssigned to Appropriations II
2018-01-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-01-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback