IL SB2281 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0785
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0785
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the purpose of the Entrepreneur Learner's Permit pilot program is to encourage and assist beginning entrepreneurs in starting new businesses (instead of "new information services, biotechnology, and green technology businesses"). Removes provisions limiting the aggregate amount of all reimbursements under the Entrepreneur Learner's Permit pilot program to $500,000 per State fiscal year. Effective immediately.
Title
DCEO-ENTREPRENEUR PERMIT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0785 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Effective Date August 10, 2018 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 22, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-05-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Economic Opportunity Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Economic Opportunity Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Commerce and Economic Development; 009-000-000 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 605 | 605-1020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |