IL SB2260 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Revenue Sharing Act. Provides that, in fiscal year 2018, each school district having Personal Property Tax Replacement Fund receipts totaling 13% or more of its total revenues in fiscal year 2016 shall receive an additional amount equal to 11% of the total amount distributed to the school district from the Personal Property Tax Replacement Fund during fiscal year 2016. Requires the State Board of Education to identify those school districts to the Department of Revenue. Provides that the total amount of additional distributions shall not exceed $4,353,136. Effective immediately.
Title
REVENUE-SCHOOL DISTRICTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 31, 2018 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 30, 2018 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-000-000 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |