IL SB2237 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $442,403 from the Snowmobile Trail Establishment Fund to the Department of Natural Resources for the administration and payment of grants to nonprofit snowmobile clubs and organizations for construction, maintenance, and rehabilitation of snowmobile trails and areas for the use of snowmobiles. Effective immediately.
Title
$DNR-SNOWMOBILES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations II |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-10-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2237&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/PDF/10000SB2237.pdf |