IL SB2225 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0820
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0820
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides for the issuance of Operation Desert Shield/Desert Storm license plates to any Illinois resident who has earned the Southwest Asia Service Medal from the United States Armed Forces. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-DESERT STORM PLATES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0820 |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Effective Date August 13, 2018 |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 011-000-000 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-07-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-07-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-07-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |