IL SB1453 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0866
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0866
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Personnel Code. Provides for the creation of a supported employees program by the Department of Central Management Services. Provides that the Director of Central Management Services shall develop and implement a supported employment program applying to all State agencies. Provides that the Director shall designate a liaison to work with the various State agencies and departments, and any funder or provider or both, in the implementation of a supported employment program. Provides that the Director, in consultation with the Secretary or Director of each State agency, shall establish job classifications for supported employees who may be appointed into the classifications without open competitive testing requirements. Provides that supported employees shall serve in a trial employment capacity for not less than 3, but no more than 12, months. Requires the Director to maintain a record of all individuals hired as supported employees, and submit an annual report to the General Assembly regarding the employment progress of supported employees, with recommendations for further legislative action. Defines terms.
Title
PERSONNEL-SUPPORTED EMPLOYEES
Sponsors
Sen. William McCann [R] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] |
Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-14 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0866 |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Effective Date August 14, 2018 |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2018-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Special Needs Services; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Special Needs Services; by Voice Vote |
2018-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Special Needs Services |
2018-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Special Needs Services |
2017-08-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-08-16 | House | First Reading |
2017-08-07 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-05-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McCann |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 005-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2017 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |