IL SB1345 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that a booking photograph shall be furnished within 72 hours after the arrest only if there is an imminent threat to public or personal safety. Provides that any person or entity engaged in publishing or otherwise disseminating criminal record information through print or electronic media shall not make booking photographs available for publishing prior to an arrestee's conviction of the crime, except a booking photograph shall be made available for publishing if the booking photograph would assist in addressing an imminent threat to public or personal safety, as determined by the chief law enforcement officer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOIA-BOOKING PHOTOGRAPHS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-03-20SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2019-03-12SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51402.15Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback