IL SB1319 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0325
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0325
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. Defines "greatest social need" for the purpose of a specified rule. Makes a conforming change. Amends the Assisted Living and Shared Housing Act. Prohibits unlawful discrimination by an owner, licensee, administrator, employee, or agent of an assisted living establishment of residents in assisted living establishments. Provides that unlawful discrimination does not include an action by an owner, licensee, administrator, employee, or agent that is required by the Act or rules adopted under the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
ASSISTED LIVING-DISCRIMINATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 20 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0325 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-020-001 |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 008-000-002 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 105 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 105 | 3.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 9 | 97 | New Code | See Bill Text |