IL SB0424 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0370
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0370
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Eliminates the repeal date of the provisions creating the First Time Weapon Offender Program. Changes the name of the Program to the First Time Weapon Offense Program. Deletes a provision that a defendant is not eligible for the Program if he or she is 21 years of age or older. Provides that the Program shall be at least 6 (rather than 18) months and not to exceed 18 (rather than 24) months. Makes other changes regarding the conditions of the Program. Effective July 1, 2023.
Title
CRIMINAL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-28 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0370 |
2023-07-28 | Senate | Effective Date July 28, 2023 |
2023-07-28 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2023-06-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-006-000 |
2023-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2023-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2023-05-25 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Harry Benton |
2023-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2023-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2023-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2023-05-25 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2023-05-25 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2023-05-25 | House | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2023 |
2023-05-25 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-05-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-25 | House | First Reading |
2023-05-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2023-05-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-016-000 |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Villivalam |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Villivalam |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 008-004-000 |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As April 28, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 642 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |