IL SB0203 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. John J. Cullerton
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Employee Arbitration Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the service of process or notice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PREVAIL WAGE-REPORT-DATABASE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 78 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-28SenateMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. John J. Cullerton
2018-11-28SenateSenate Concurs
2018-11-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 044-006-000
2018-11-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 044-006-000
2018-11-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-11-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-11-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-11-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-11-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-11-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-11-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - November 28, 2018
2018-11-28SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2018-11-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2018-11-28HouseMotion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-11-28HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-11-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 078-028-001
2018-11-28House3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-008-000
2018-11-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-11-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2018-11-14HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-14HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-000-000
2018-11-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-11-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-11-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2018-11-12HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis
2018-11-07HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-05-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-30HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-30HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-30HouseArrived in House
2018-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Lightford
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Lightford
2018-05-29SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-25SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2018
2018-05-24SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2017-04-25SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
820358Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=203&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0203.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0203eng.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0203sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0203sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0203ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0203ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0203_05292018_014000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB0203_11282018_004000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0203ham002_11282018_040001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0203ham001_11282018_040000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback