IL SB0156 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0397
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Innovation and Technology Act and the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Director of Corrections and the Secretary of Innovation and Technology shall jointly adopt a rule or best practices protocol that permits each committed person in a Department of Corrections institution or facility to access specific and approved job search and career building websites within a specified period before the person's release from the Department of Corrections institution or facility and to access only those job search and career building websites.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PRISONER ACCESS JOB WEBSITES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-16SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0397
2019-08-16SenateEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-16SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-19SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy
2019-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-02HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-04-30HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 017-000-000
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-07HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-07HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-03-06HouseArrived in House
2019-03-06SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2019
2019-03-05SenateSecond Reading
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2019-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2019
2019-02-21SenateDo Pass State Government; 008-000-000
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-29SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-29SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2013701-46New CodeSee Bill Text
73053-7-8New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback