IL SB0135 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act. Provides that the Illinois Power Agency shall conduct at least one workshop and issue a report regarding the importance of fuel diversity in Illinois for capacity. Provides that the Agency shall conduct at least one workshop and issue a report on the level of demand response resources in the Illinois capacity markets and the benefits that demand response brings to wholesale markets and demand response providers, and identify barriers to market participation by consumers. Provides that the reports shall be submitted to the Governor and the General Assembly, as well as posted on the Internet website of the Agency, on or before March 1, 2020. Repeals the provisions on January 1, 2021. Effective immediately.
Title
ICC-WORKSHOPS AND REPORTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Re-referred to Energy and Public Utilities |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Energy and Public Utilities; 013-000-000 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3855 | 1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |