IL HB3085 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Mandatory Labeling of Genetically Modified Foods Act. Requires genetically engineered raw agricultural commodities and processed foods offered for retail sale to bear certain labels. Creates exemptions for certain classes of products. Grants the Illinois Department of Agriculture the authority to adopt rules necessary to implement the Act. Requires the Department to annually publish a list of raw agricultural commodities commonly cultivated in a genetically engineered form. Provides for enforcement of the Act by the Department and the Attorney General. Contains a severability provision. Effective January 1, 2014.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GENETICALLY MODIFIED FOODS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-03HouseSession Sine Die
2014-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2014-03-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2014-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2014-03-06HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2014-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon-Booth
2014-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2014-02-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2014-02-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
2014-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams
2013-12-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2013-10-24HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2013-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2013-03-22HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2013-03-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2013-03-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2013-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2013-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deborah Mell
2013-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2013-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2013-03-07HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2013-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2013-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2013-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly Burke
2013-03-07HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly Burke
2013-03-07HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2013-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2013-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly Burke
2013-02-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2013-02-26HouseFirst Reading
2013-02-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Deborah Mell

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback