IL HJRCA0005 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes to amend the Executive Article of the Illinois Constitution. Eliminates the office of Lieutenant Governor, beginning with the term of office otherwise commencing in 2019. Effective upon being declared adopted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CON AMEND-ABOLISH LT GOVERNOR

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseRead in Full a First Time
2017-01-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback