IL HJR0140 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on September 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the Auditor General to conduct a performance audit of the Illinois State Police Division of Forensic Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ISP-FORENSIC SERVICES-AUDIT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-11-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-11-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-11-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-11-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-11-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-09-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-09-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-09-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-09-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-09-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-09-12HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback