IL HJR0118 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-20 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the portion of Illinois Route 116 from Roanoke to Metamora as the "SPC Phillip J. Pannier Memorial Highway".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SPC PHILLIP PANNIER HIGHWAY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-14 - House - Motion in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-11-20SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-11-20SenateArrive in Senate
2018-11-14HouseResolution Adopted 110-000-000
2018-11-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-11-07HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-05-22HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-05-15HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-04-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-05HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback