IL HJR0105 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-28 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-28 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the Route 23 bridge in Streator over the Vermilion River as the "Vietnam Veteran Michael W. Ragusa Memorial Bridge".
Title
MICHAEL RAGUSA MEMORIAL BRIDGE
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Long [R] | Sen. Susan Rezin [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-28 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-28 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 051-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-25 | House | Resolution Adopted 112-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-04-17 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-04-03 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Lee Long |