IL HB5814 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-7)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1064
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-7)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1064
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Provides that interest penalties that may be payable under the Act, as provided under specified Sections of the Illinois Insurance Code, shall be paid from a separate appropriation from each fund for such purpose and for each appropriated agency. Amends the State Budget Law. Provides that for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2018, and for each fiscal year thereafter, the budget shall include a separate line item request appropriating moneys to each State agency for estimated costs for each fund under the State Prompt Payment Act and specified Sections of the Illinois Insurance Code. Amends the State Finance Act. Provides that the sum of transfers among line item appropriations for an agency in a fiscal year shall not exceed 2% of the aggregate amount appropriated to it within the same treasury fund for, among other objects, late interest penalties under the State Prompt Payment Act and specified Sections of the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that if lump sum appropriations are enacted with a separate line item for late interest penalties under the State Prompt Payment Act and the Illinois Insurance Code, the 2% transfer authority shall apply to the aggregate amount of these appropriations. Amends the State Prompt Payment Act to provide that interest penalties that may be payable under the Act and under specified Sections of the Illinois Insurance Code shall be paid from a separate appropriation from each fund for such purpose and for each appropriated agency. Effective immediately.
Title
PROMPT PAYMNT-INTEREST PENALTY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1064 |
2018-08-24 | House | Effective Date August 24, 2018 |
2018-08-24 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 006-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-04-20 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-04-20 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 20 | 38.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 20 | 50-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 13.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 540 | 3-6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 375 | 6.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |