IL HB5769 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Vetoed on January 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-15 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-15 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires that on or before July 1, 2019, the Department of Insurance and Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall jointly develop a uniform prior authorization form to be used by prescribing providers to request prior authorization for prescription drug benefits. Provides that on and after January 1, 2020, health insurers and managed care organizations that provide prescription drug benefits shall utilize and accept the uniform prior authorization form and prescribing providers may use the uniform prior authorization form. Provides criteria for developing the uniform prior authorization form. Provides requirements and limitations of prior authorization requests. Effective January 1, 2019.
Title
DRUGS-PRIOR AUTHORIZATION FORM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-15 | House | Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto |
2019-01-11 | House | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2018-12-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2018-11-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 28, 2018 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2018-11-20 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-11-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2018-11-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-11-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-13 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-10-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-08-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-31 | House | Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-05-31 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Insurance: Health & Life Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-05-21 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 009-005-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Insurance: Health & Life Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 364.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.12b | New Code | See Bill Text |