IL HB5649 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that battery against a peace officer during the course of the defendant's arrest that results in bodily harm to the peace officer, where the court, after a hearing, determines that the release of the defendant would pose a real and present threat to the physical safety of any person or persons, if the proof is evident or the presumption great that the defendant is guilty of the offense, is non-bailable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM PRO-NON-BAILABLE OFFENSES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12HouseTabled
2018-04-12HouseTabled Pursuant to Rule 22(g)-5
2018-04-12HouseMotion Do Not Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 004-002-000; -SUBCOMMITEE
2018-04-12HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-12HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-10HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Jim Durkin
2018-04-09HouseTo Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255110-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback