IL HB5481 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that, no later than day 60 of instruction in each school year, a school board shall report to the State Board of Education for kindergarten through grade 12 classes certain information about actively employed teachers, pupil-teacher ratios, class instructors, and class sections; defines terms. Requires the State Board of Education to publish the information contained in the reports on its Internet website no later than December 1, 2019 and annually thereafter. Sets forth class size goals to be achieved by the 2020-2021 school year.
Title
SCH CD-CLASS SIZE GOALS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-27 - House - Motion in House (Y: 69 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | House | Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken |
2018-11-27 | House | Override Governor Veto - House Lost 069-042-000 |
2018-11-27 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-27 | House | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-11-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2018-08-19 | House | Governor Vetoed |
2018-06-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 036-014-000 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 007-004-000 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-04-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-045-001 |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 005-002-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.67 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.136a | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.60 | New Code | See Bill Text |