IL HB5332 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Healthy Food Program Development Act. Provides that the Department of Agriculture may coordinate with the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to establish a Healthy Food Development Program to expand access to healthy foods in eligible areas in the State by providing assistance to grocery stores, corner stores, farmers markets, and other small food retailers. Provides that the benefits provided shall be awarded to grocery stores, corner stores, farmers markets, and other small food retailers in eligible areas on a competitive basis, with priority given to projects with the greatest potential impact on expanding access to healthy foods ineligible areas that are underserved by retail sales of healthy food in the State. Provides requirements for participation in the program. Provides that the Department shall designate a grocery ambassador to assist retailers of healthy foods in this State by: (1) providing research and data on eligible areas with insufficient grocery access; (2) coordinating with the Department and the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity and other relevant State agencies; (3) providing assistance to small grocery retailers in this State, including obtaining and expediting regulatory procedures; and (4) providing other assistance as needed. Provides that the Department, in coordination with the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity, shall convene a working group to develop a plan for establishing a commercial distribution system, for fresh produce and healthy foods to corner stores and other small food retailers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HEALTHY FOOD ACCESS PROGRAM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseTo Growth, Reform & Fairness Subcommittee
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback