IL HB5241 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children with Disabilities Article of the School Code. Provides that, in a school district with a population of more than 500,000 inhabitants, the principal and all school personnel who are regular members of an individualized education program team shall determine the special education staffing needs of the school based on individualized education program minutes, status of the school's least restrictive environment, optimal scheduling protocols, and other relevant factors. Provides that once a staffing level is set, the school board shall provide full staffing for the school and shall fund the total cost of each position. Provides that the school board may not reduce the special education staffing levels of a school in which the general staffing levels are less than 90% of the State average. Provides that the school board may require more efficient staff scheduling if the scheduling does not impair or hinder any reasonable goals of the school's general education program. Prohibits the school district from banning the use of any measure that would prevent or delay an individualized education program team from adding a service to the program or creating a time restriction in which a service is prohibited from being added to the program. Makes other changes. Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-SPECIAL EDU STAFFING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-001-000
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105514-11.01aNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback