IL HB5198 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that the portion of a site or facility that receives, separates, stores, and converts post-use polymers into crude oil, fuels, or other raw materials or intermediate or final products or feedstocks using a pyrolysis or gasification process and is regulated under the State's air, water, and waste regulations applicable to manufacturing facilities is not a pollution control facility under the Act. Provides that the definition of "waste" does not include post-use polymers or nonrecycled feedstocks processed through pyrolysis or gasification. Makes changes to the definition for "municipal waste incineration" in provisions concerning municipal waste incineration emission standards. Defines terms. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

POLLUTION CONTROL FACILITY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 81 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2018
2018-05-21SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 21, 2018
2018-05-18SenateDo Pass Environment and Conservation; 008-000-000
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-05-08SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2018-05-02SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseMotion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-04-27HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 081-020-000
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Environment; 016-000-000
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Environment
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment; 012-006-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment; by Voice Vote
2018-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Environment
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
415522.16bAmended CodeCitation Text
41553.201New CodeSee Bill Text
41553.202New CodeSee Bill Text
41553.299New CodeSee Bill Text
41553.32Amended CodeCitation Text
41553.330Amended CodeCitation Text
41553.336New CodeSee Bill Text
41553.366New CodeSee Bill Text
41553.367New CodeSee Bill Text
41553.53Amended CodeCitation Text
41553.535Amended CodeCitation Text
41559.4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback