IL HB5197 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-6)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0656
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-6)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0656
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a department foreign fire insurance board shall be created within the fire department of all municipalities (rather than municipalities with fewer than 500,000 inhabitants) that have an organized fire department. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI-FOREIGN FIRE INSURANCE BD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 101 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0656 |
2018-07-31 | House | Effective Date July 31, 2018 |
2018-07-31 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 House Concurs 101-007-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Fire & Emergency Services Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 4 |
2018-05-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-007-001 |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-10-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |