IL HB5143 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Animal Research and Production Facilities Protection Act. Adds definition for "deprive". Changes current prohibited acts into animal facility tampering and adds disrupting operations at the animal facility, if the operations directly relate to agricultural production, animal maintenance, veterinary care, or educational or scientific purposes. Creates the offense of animal facility interference for creating or possessing, without the consent of the owner, a visual or sound recording made at the animal facility, which reproduces a visual or audio experience occurring at the facility. Also includes in animal facility interference exercising control over the animal facility with the intent to deprive the facility of an animal or property, and entering a facility not open to the public. Animal facility interference is a Class A misdemeanor for a first offense and a Class 4 felony for a second or subsequent offense. Creates the offense of animal facility fraud that retains the current entering a facility under false pretenses, and by theft or deception obtain control over facility property. Adds to animal facility fraud making a false statement or representation on a facility employment application, with the intent to commit an act not authorized by the facility. Penalty for animal facility fraud is a Class 4 felony to a Class 1 felony depending on the amount of loss or damage inflicted. Adds to current civil remedies an authorization for civil damages of treble the amount of actual damages, plus court costs and attorney fees. Provides an exception to animal facility tampering and animal facility interference for certain persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ANIMAL FACILITY - OFFENSES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09HouseTabled By Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia
2012-03-09HouseMotion Prevailed by Voice Vote
2012-03-06HouseMotion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Jim Sacia
2012-02-27HouseAssigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
2012-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2012-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2012-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Sacia

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7202153Amended CodeCitation Text
7202154Amended CodeCitation Text
7202154.3New CodeSee Bill Text
7202154.5New CodeSee Bill Text
7202155Amended CodeCitation Text
7202156Amended CodeCitation Text
7202156.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback