IL HB5056 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Defines "road machine". Provides that the owner of a junk vehicle is not required to surrender the vehicle's certificate of title under certain circumstances. Provides that the Secretary of State may use alternating numeric and alphabetical characters when issuing a special registration plate. Provides that a permanent vehicle registration plate shall be issued for a one-time fee of $8 to certain types of buses operating within a municipality. Provides that any vehicle with a permanent vehicle registration plate owned or operated by a public school district from grades K-12, a public community college, or a medical facility or hospital is exempt from any fee for the transfer of registration. Provides that the Secretary shall notify the State Police or the Secretary of State Department of Police if an application for a certificate of title or registration of a vehicle and the vehicle has been reported stolen or converted is received. Provides that the Secretary of State Department of Police shall conduct an investigation concerning the identity of the registered owner of the vehicle. Allows the Secretary of State Department of Police to restore, restamp, or reaffix a vehicle identification number plate or affix a new plate bearing the original manufacturer's vehicle identification number. Provides that a new or used vehicle dealer cannot issue any other person a newly created key to a vehicle without a color photocopy or electronic scan of the driver's license or identification card. Provides that for certain recyclable metals, a scrap processor shall obtain a color photocopy or electronic scan of the driver's license or identification card. Repeals a provision providing for 2-year registration period for buses operating within a municipality. Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 109-000-000
2018-05-29HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
2018-05-24HouseArrived in House
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass as Amended Transportation; 017-000-000
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation
2018-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2018-05-02SenatePostponed - Transportation
2018-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation
2018-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2018-04-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-04-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-13SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-04-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-13SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-12HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62551-177.5New CodeSee Bill Text
62553-117.1Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-405.1Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-414Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-600Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-803Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-804.01Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-807Repealed CodeCitation Text
62553-808.1Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-815Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-821Amended CodeCitation Text
62554-107Amended CodeCitation Text
62555-101Amended CodeCitation Text
62555-102Amended CodeCitation Text
62555-401.3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5056&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5056.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5056eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5056enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5056ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5056sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5056sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB5056_04122018_006000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB5056_05242018_038000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB5056sam002_05312018_073000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback