IL HB4967 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that any person legally authorized to treat, transport, or store human remains, except as authorized by law, shall not: (1) knowingly and intentionally provide inaccurate documentation of the identity of human remains to an individual or organization; (2) knowingly and intentionally store human remains in violation of Illinois law; or (3) knowingly and intentionally provide an individual or organization with human remains that are intentionally misidentified. Provides that a violation is a Class 4 felony.
Title
CRIM CD-MISHANDLE HUMAN REMAIN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal |