IL HB4965 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-8)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0909
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-8)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0909
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. In provisions concerning the child care assistance program, provides that a family's eligibility for child care services shall be redetermined no sooner than 12 months following the initial determination or most recent redetermination. Provides that during the 12-month periods, the family shall remain eligible for child care services regardless of (i) a change in family income, unless family income exceeds 85% of State median income, or (ii) a temporary change in the ongoing status of the parents as working or attending a job training or educational program. Effective October 1, 2018.
Title
CHILD CARE SERVICE-ELIGIBILITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0909 |
2018-08-17 | House | Effective Date October 1, 2018 |
2018-08-17 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-015-000 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 006-003-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-003-000 |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 9A-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |