IL HB4907 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0861
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0861
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that the Department of Human Services, in consultation with the Advisory Committee, shall adopt rules allowing licensed prescribers or pharmacists who have registered to access the Prescription Monitoring Program to authorize a licensed or non-licensed designee (rather than any designee) employed in that licensed prescriber's office or licensed pharmacist's pharmacy and who has received training in the federal Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act to consult the Prescription Monitoring Program on their behalf. Requires the Clinical Director of the Prescription Monitoring Program to select 6 members (rather than 5 members), 3 physicians, 2 pharmacists, and one dentist, of the Prescription Monitoring Program Advisory Committee to serve as members of the peer review subcommittee. Effective immediately.
Title
CONTROL SUB-PMP&ADV COMMITTEE
Sponsors
Rep. Michael McAuliffe [R] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Timothy Butler [R] | Sen. Dave Syverson [R] |
Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Sen. Steven Landek [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0861 |
2018-08-15 | House | Effective Date August 14, 2018 |
2018-08-14 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2018-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 570 | 316 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |