IL HB4887 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0680
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0680
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Requires the Department of Children and Family Services to assist youth in care in identifying and obtaining documents necessary to function as an independent adult prior to the closure of the youth's case to terminate wardship under the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that the necessary documents shall include, but not be limited to: State identification card or driver's license; social security card; medical records; educational records; and other documents. Provides that if a court orders that the wardship of a youth in care be terminated and all proceedings under the Juvenile Court Act of 1987 respecting the youth in care finally closed and discharged, the Department shall ensure that the youth in care has a copy of the court's order. Provides that a court shall find that it is in the minor's best interest to continue wardship of a minor if the Department of Children and Family Services has not made reasonable efforts to ensure that the minor has documents necessary for adult living. Provides that it shall not be in the minor's best interest to terminate wardship of a minor over the age of 18 who is in the Department's guardianship if the Department has not made reasonable efforts to ensure that the minor has documents necessary for adult living.
Title
DCFS-YOUTH-NECESSARY DOCUMENTS
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Rep. Nicholas Sauer [R] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] |
Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0680 |
2018-08-03 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-03 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-04-25 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-04-10 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-03-23 | House | To Domestic Relations Law Subcommittee |
2018-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 35.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
705 | 405 | 2-31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |